Krishnan, Usha (CPSO#: 80520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 308
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-1475
Fax: (705) 797-1476
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Usha Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Krishnan ( CPSO# 80520 )

Business Address:
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 308
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 02 May 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007