Krishnaprasad, Degala Venkata (CPSO#: 53392)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Andhra University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Centre Unit 1A-2 1595 Merivale Road Ottawa ON K2B 7Y6
Date Received: 04 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)