Krishnar, Kannan (CPSO#: 69441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bronte Health Clinic
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kannan Krishnar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Krishnar ( CPSO# 69441 )

Business Address:
Bronte Health Clinic
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone Number: (905) 827-9865

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANNAN KRISHNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1997