Krisman, Avery Alexander (CPSO#: 61346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone: (416) 966-9256
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVERY ALEXANDER KRISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1991

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Avery Alexander Krisman:

(1)between January 1, 2007 and December 31, 2009 at the City of Toronto did, with an object, namely a toy doll, for a sexual purpose, directly touch the body of a person under the age of 14 years, namely XX, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(2)between January 1, 2007 and December 31, 2009 at the City of Toronto did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(3) between January 1, 2009 and September 9, 2011 at the City of Stratford did, for a sexual purpose, invite a person under the age of 16 years, namely XX to directly touch with a part of her body the body of Avery Krisman, contrary to Section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(4) between January 1, 2009 and September 9, 2011 at the City of Stratford did, with his body, namely his hand, for a sexual purpose, directly touch the body of a person under the age of 16 years, namely XX, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(5)between January 1, 2009 and September 9, 2011 at the City of Stratford did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: December 11, 2017
Place of charge: Toronto, ON
Toronto Police Service