Kristensen, John Williams (CPSO#: 26525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAMS KRISTENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISTENSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016