Kristof, Francis Eugene (CPSO#: 21855)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 24, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
By way of letter dated November 28, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notification from the Chief of Staff of Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital that a temporary suspension of Dr. Kristof’s privileges was implemented effective November 24, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017