Krmpotic, Kristina Rose (CPSO#: 86438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5850/5980 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone: 9024708802
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krmpotic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA ROSE KRMPOTIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRMPOTIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012