Kronfli, Nadine (CPSO#: 95925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Centre
1001 Decarie Boulevard D02.4110
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: 514-934-1934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE KRONFLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRONFLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015