Kronick, Stanley Harris (CPSO#: 23842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apple Tree Clinic
225 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7R1
Phone: (613) 288-0279
Fax: (613) 288-2442
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stanley Kronick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kronick ( CPSO# 23842 )

Business Address:
Apple Tree Clinic
225 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7R1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY HARRIS KRONICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRONICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976