Kronis, Sarah Ellen (CPSO#: 82413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203-4256Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M3H5Y8
Phone: 416 635 5012
Fax: 416 635 5018
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Yorkland Blvd., Unit 403
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELLEN KRONIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRONIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007