Krop, Jozef (CPSO#: 29036)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 28 Jul 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Dec 1998
Summary:

 In December 1998, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Krop guilty of professional misconduct as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22).

On June 22, 1999, the Discipline Committee 
 ordered the following penalty:

1)	A reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register;
2)	Dr. Krop(s certificate of registration is to be subject to the following 
 conditions:
(a)	Dr. Krop is required to adhere to the 11 recommendations with respect to members, 
 from the Report of the Ad Hoc Committee on Complementary Medicine, for assessing patients, 
 treating patients and advancing knowledge;
(b)	In addition, prior to any use of Vega testing, 
 provocation neutralization testing, serial dilution end point titration testing for non-inhalant 
 sensitivities including candida-related sensitivity, and hair analysis when not used in the 
 diagnosis of heavy metal toxicity or essential element deficiency, Dr. Krop:
(I)	is required to 
 provide to the patient sufficient information to make informed choices;
(ii)	is required not to 
 misrepresent information or opinion; and
(iii)	is required to give the patient the general degree 
 of certainty or uncertainty of efficacy of the test(s), notwithstanding his individual beliefs.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 30 Jan 2002
Hearing Date(s): Apr 27, 1998

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 13, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Jozef Krop to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Jozef Krop, undertake never to apply for a license with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.