Krupa, Norman Kenneth (CPSO#: 29882)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Krupa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 2 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 13 Mar 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 2017