Kruzyk, George Jurii Konstantin (CPSO#: 56796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: Kruzyk, Jurii Konstantin (used until: 27 Oct 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone: (705) 722-9668
Fax: (705) 726-1755
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kruzyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kruzyk ( CPSO# 56796 )

Business Address:
103 - 115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 722-9668

Business Address:
LL#1
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE JURII KONSTANTIN KRUZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUZYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1988