Kryworuchko, Alexandra (CPSO#: 23567)

Current Status: Suspended as of 26 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Italian, Russian, Slovak, Spanish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 08 Dec 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 26 Sep 2011


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2011
Summary:

 On April 6, 2011, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Kryworuchko is incapacitated, as 
 defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. 

On September 26, 2011, the 
 Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Kryworuchko's certificate of registration for an 
 indefinite period, with the provision that any future removal of the suspension will require an 
 objective demonstration to the satisfaction of the College that safe practice could be assured.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 17-21, January 31-February 4, 2011