Krzyzanowska, Monika Karolina (CPSO#: 69121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite OPG 7-825
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6542
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA KAROLINA KRZYZANOWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRZYZANOWSKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000