Kuang, Ju-Kuo (CPSO#: 24960)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1998