Kubac, George (CPSO#: 59290)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: Arabic

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 1988 to 15 May 1988
Other - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1988