Kucey, Daryl Stanton (CPSO#: 57393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 966-3886
Fax: (416) 487-8746
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl S. Kucey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kucey ( CPSO# 57393 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 966-3886

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYL STANTON KUCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987