Kuch, Klaus (CPSO#: 26005)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005