Kucharski, Julia Mary (CPSO#: 99126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA MARY KUCHARSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KUCHARSKI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. KUCHARSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KUCHARSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KUCHARSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KUCHARSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KUCHARSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Jul 2012 to 11 Oct 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018