Kuchtaruk, Andrew Ihor (CPSO#: 51004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1935 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3C6
Phone: (705) 523-4522
Fax: (705) 523-4524
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Kuchtaruk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuchtaruk ( CPSO# 51004 )

Business Address:
1935 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 523-4522

Business Address:
101 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW IHOR KUCHTARUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHTARUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)