Kuchuk, Michael (CPSO#: 96817)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ukrainian Medical and Dental Academy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2011 to 13 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 14 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013