Kuder, Gerald Ralph (CPSO#: 18618)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2009