Kudrym, Eryk Ireneusz (CPSO#: 44106)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Kudrym, Eric Ireneusz (used until: 28 Jul 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Psychotherapy Counselling Centre 2150 Bloor Street West Toronto, ON M6S 1M8
Date Received: 30 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014