Kudsia, Seema Ashish (CPSO#: 86875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Site
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seema Kudsia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kudsia ( CPSO# 86875 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners - Credit Valley Site
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2696

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEEMA ASHISH KUDSIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUDSIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013