Kugathasan, Kaplan (CPSO#: 98203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Kugathasan, Kapilan (used until: 30 Oct 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: 519-751-5502
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
1230 North Shore Blvd East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kugathasan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kugathasan ( CPSO# 98203 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAPLAN KUGATHASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUGATHASAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014