Kugler, Pierre Ernst Arthur (CPSO#: 59303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: (519) 744-9693
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kugler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kugler ( CPSO# 59303 )

Business Address:
135 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 744-9693

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE ERNST ARTHUR KUGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUGLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989