Kuhn, Magdalena (CPSO#: 54804)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1990