Kukha-Mohamad, Shirwan Abdulla (CPSO#: 64934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 Fourth Avenue North
Saskatoon SK  S7K 2L7
Phone: 3062442421
Fax: 3062442425

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRWAN ABDULLA KUKHA-MOHAMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKHA-MOHAMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014