Kukreja, Raluca (CPSO#: 87041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: Tipu, Raluca (used until: 09 Dec 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-4744
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raluca Kukreja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kukreja ( CPSO# 87041 )

Business Address:
410 - 325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
1105 Kingston Road
200A Building E
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALUCA KUKREJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKREJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012