Kukreti, Asha (CPSO#: 51006)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients should contact the clinic where they were seen by Dr. Kukreti for copies of their records.
Instructions: Agincourt Medical Centre 416.293.2404 Ellesmere Road Clinic 416.439.8497
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014