Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kulasingham, Shaneka (CPSO#: 69003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 38511
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Poon and Dr. Shaneka Kulasingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Poon ( CPSO# 69019 )
Dr. S. Kulasingham ( CPSO# 69003 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANEKA KULASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997