Kulisiewicz, Gawel Tomasz (CPSO#: 89521)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2009