Kulkarni, Abhaya Vivek (CPSO#: 68122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6427
Fax: (416) 813-4975
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.V. Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 68122 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
1503 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6427

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHAYA VIVEK KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002