Kulkarni, Chetana Avinash (CPSO#: 77601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8941
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chetana Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 77601 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHETANA AVINASH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008