Kulkarni, Girish Satish (CPSO#: 76443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
700 University Avenue
Suite 6-824
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2246
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 76443 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2246

Business Address:
6-827 - 700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 946-2246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIRISH SATISH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011