Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kulkarni, Ramesh (CPSO#: 70716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1221 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 495-0844
Fax: (705) 495-6698
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 70716 )

Business Address:
405 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 495-0844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMESH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 17 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1998