Kulkarni, Sadhana Vishwanath (CPSO#: 94097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Island Eye Center
Suite 201- 1771 Comox Ave
Comox BC  V9M 3L9
Phone: (250) 890-3333
Fax: (250) 890-0090
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's General Hospital
2137 Comox Ave
Comox BC  V9M 1P2
Canada
Phone: (250) 339-2242
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADHANA VISHWANATH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014