Kulkarni, Savita Satish (CPSO#: 32165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Pathology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 62008
Fax: (416) 242-1076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Savita Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 32165 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Pathology Department
Room 2E, 2108
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAVITA SATISH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1981