Kulkarni, Swati (CPSO#: 81220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Program
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Ext. 58000
Fax: (519) 253-4204
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swati Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 81220 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SWATI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008