Kulkarni, Vaibhav Janardan (CPSO#: 57233)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish

Education:University of Bombay, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 19 May 1996
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jul 1996
Summary:

 In July 1996, Dr. Kulkarni pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he 
 sexually abused a patient, as defined in s. 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, 
 being Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended.  Dr. Kulkarni also 
 pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 856/93, as 
 amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, as defined in 
 s. 1(1)2, and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine, that 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, as defined in s. 1(1)33.  The Committee accepted these pleas and 
 found Dr. Kulkarni guilty of professional misconduct.

Consequently, the Discipline Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Kulkarni be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register, and that his licence to practice medicine be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 29, 1996

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2004
Decision: Application Denied