Kulpa, Janus (CPSO#: 68061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3434 Bienville Blvd
Ocean Springs MS  39564
United States
Phone: (228) 875-1599
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4A-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: 905-232-0720
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANUS KULPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULPA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010