Kumana, Cyrus Rustam (CPSO#: 31148)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2004