Kumanan, Mekalai (CPSO#: 84565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kumanan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kumanan ( CPSO# 84565 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 740-5010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEKALAI KUMANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008