Kumar, Anand (CPSO#: 56799)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1996