Kumar, Balagopal Santosh (CPSO#: 87091)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 11 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011