Kumar, Brinda Cauhalagala Prasanna (CPSO#: 29373)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 401 4430 Bathurst Street Downsview, ON M3H 3S3
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2015