Kumar, Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna (CPSO#: 23759)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-(800)-775-0093 Fax: 1-(888)-316-4125 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Oct 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2018