Kumar, Deepa (CPSO#: 71362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deepa Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kumar ( CPSO# 71362 )

Business Address:
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone Number: (905) 820-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002