Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kumar, Deepali (CPSO#: 70223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Munk Building
Room 11-174
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4241
Fax: (416) 340-4043
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumar - Humar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kumar ( CPSO# 70223 )
Dr. A. Humar ( CPSO# 65104 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
PMB-11-175 or Room 11-174
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPALI KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013